MN SF1100 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prairie Island Indian Community to exercise concurrent state law enforcement jurisdictional authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prairie Island Indian Community to exercise concurrent state law enforcement jurisdictional authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-05-22 Governor approval
2019-05-22 Secretary of State Chapter 40
2019-05-22 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-22 Presented to Governor
2019-05-17SenateReturned from House
2019-05-17HouseSenate concurrence and repassage Senate concurrence unnecessary; amended to original Senate language
2019-05-17HouseBill was passed
2019-05-17HouseThird reading as amended
2019-05-17HouseAmended
2019-05-15HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 17, 2019
2019-05-15HouseSecond reading
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-05-14HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-05-09HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-05-09HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-08SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateSpecial Order
2019-03-14SenateSecond reading
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF719 (Similar To) 2019-04-12 - Author added Bernardy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback