MN SF11 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic monitoring in nursing facilities and assisted living facilities requirements establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic monitoring in nursing facilities and assisted living facilities requirements establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateGeneral Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading
2019-02-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-01-14SenateAuthors added Rest; Relph; Abeler; Eken
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Family Care and Aging
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF146 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Author added Drazkowski

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback