MN SF1093 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Personal care assistance compensation for services provided by a parent or spouse; appropriation
Title
Personal care assistance compensation for services provided by a parent or spouse; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Authors added Housley; Hoffman |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1159 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Joint rule 2.03 waived