MN SF1077 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Digital Fair Repair Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital Fair Repair Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateAuthor added Dibble
2019-03-07SenateAuthor added Abeler
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-02-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1138 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Authors added Long and Bernardy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback