MN SF1060 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - HF passed, no substitution HF861
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - HF passed, no substitution HF861
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus transportation funding and policy bill
Title
Omnibus transportation funding and policy bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | HF passed, no substitution HF861 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Laid on table |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-28 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF861 (Similar To) 2017-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 62