MN SF1047 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Power purchase agreement for certain electric cogeneration activities authorization
Title
Power purchase agreement for certain electric cogeneration activities authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: 71 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-15 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-15 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: 71 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-15 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-15 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 23 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-15 | House | Amendments offered |
2021-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 15, 2021 |
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1255 |
2021-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1255 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed