MN SF104 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officers use of force updated policies requirement
Title
Peace officers use of force updated policies requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 71 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 58 - Amendment to Neu Amendment - Nays (Y: 75 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 75 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 65 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - House: S. F. No. 104 (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 74 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 58 - Amendment to Neu Amendment - Nays (Y: 75 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 75 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 65 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - House: S. F. No. 104 (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House: 74 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2020-06-18 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-06-18 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-06-18 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2020-06-18 | House | Amended |
2020-06-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-06-18 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-06-18 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-06-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2020-06-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | By Motion, Laid on Table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |