MN SF1019 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provisions governing the Office of Legislative Auditor activities modification and appropriation
Title
Provisions governing the Office of Legislative Auditor activities modification and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Authors added Kiffmeyer; Klein; Frentz |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF994 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Second reading