MN SF1004 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

License reinstatement diversion pilot program permanency authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License reinstatement diversion pilot program permanency authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading
2019-03-25SenateTo pass
2019-03-18SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-02-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF898 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Re-referred by committee to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback