MN SF100 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Energy storage system pilot projects criteria for utility cost recovery establishment; investor-owned utilities to include in integrated resource plans an assessment of energy storage systems requirement; cost-benefit analysis of energy storage systems requirement; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy storage system pilot projects criteria for utility cost recovery establishment; investor-owned utilities to include in integrated resource plans an assessment of energy storage systems requirement; cost-benefit analysis of energy storage systems requirement; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReferred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-21HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-21SenateThird reading Passed
2019-02-21SenateSpecial Order
2019-01-28SenateAuthor added Rosen
2019-01-28SenateSecond reading
2019-01-28SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-01-17SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-01-14SenateReferred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF165 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Author changed Baker (Chief)

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback