MN SF1 | 2017 | 90th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus state government appropriations bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus state government appropriations bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 19 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Urgency declared rules suspended (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Secretary of State Chapter 4
2017-05-30 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-26 Presented to Governor
2017-05-25HouseBill was passed vote: 99-32
2017-05-25HouseThird reading
2017-05-25HouseSecond reading
2017-05-25HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2017-05-25HouseIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-25HouseReceived from Senate
2017-05-25SenateReturned from House
2017-05-25SenateThird reading Passed vote: 45-17
2017-05-25SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2017-05-25SenateTaken from table
2017-05-23SenateLaid on table
2017-05-23SenateSecond reading
2017-05-23SenateUrgency declared rules suspended vote: 54-11
2017-05-23SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback