MN HF999 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Author added Green
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Author added Green
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employers prohibited from discipline or discharge for employee or applicant immunization refusal, and civil action remedies provided.
Title
Employers prohibited from discipline or discharge for employee or applicant immunization refusal, and civil action remedies provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Green |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Heintzeman |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SF1916 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Authors added Mathews; Westrom