MN HF991 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Senate conferees Nelson; Weber; Miller; Bakk; Rest
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus tax bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus tax bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 68 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 64 - Amendment to Davids Amendment - Nays (Y: 68 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseSenate conferees Nelson; Weber; Miller; Bakk; Rest
2021-04-29HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
2021-04-29HouseHouse conferees Marquart, Youakim, Her, Lislegard, Davids
2021-04-29HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2021-04-29HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2021-04-29SenateSenate conferees Nelson; Weber; Miller; Bakk; Rest
2021-04-29SenateSenate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
2021-04-29SenateHouse conferees Marquart; Youakim; Her; Lislegard; Davids
2021-04-29SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2021-04-28SenateThird reading Passed
2021-04-28SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2021-04-27SenateSecond reading
2021-04-27SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF961
2021-04-26SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF961
2021-04-26SenateIntroduction and first reading
2021-04-26SenateReceived from House
2021-04-23HouseBill was passed
2021-04-22HouseThird reading
2021-04-22HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2021-04-22HouseAmendments offered
2021-04-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 22, 2021
2021-04-20HouseSecond reading
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-02-15HouseAuthor added Youakim
2021-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF961 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF991

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback