MN HF983 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; ranked-choice voting adoption by jurisdictions authorized; adoption, implementation, and use of ranked-choice voting procedures established; electronic voting systems with reallocation feature use by municipalities allowed; and rulemaking authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; ranked-choice voting adoption by jurisdictions authorized; adoption, implementation, and use of ranked-choice voting procedures established; electronic voting systems with reallocation feature use by municipalities allowed; and rulemaking authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseCommittee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means
2020-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
2020-02-24HouseAuthor added Bierman
2020-02-19HouseReturned by Chair to Government Operations as amended, subcommittee engrossment available under list versions
2019-05-17HouseAuthor added Christensen
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-02-13HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF2424 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback