MN HF973 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Cantrell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota Pollution Control Agency Citizens Board reinstated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota Pollution Control Agency Citizens Board reinstated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Stephenson
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Fischer
2019-03-21HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Hansen
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF627 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback