MN HF973 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Community service partner demonstration project collaboration funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community service partner demonstration project collaboration funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
2015-02-26HouseAuthor added Persell.
2015-02-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Reform
2015-02-23HouseAuthor added Moran.
2015-02-19HouseAuthor added Bly.
2015-02-16HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF906 (Similar To) 2015-02-16 - Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback