MN HF970 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health services; various provisions modified, including payment process, health professional education loan forgiveness, mental health professional licensing board and practitioner requirements, and clinical trainee supervision; reports required; and money appropriated.
Title
Mental health services; various provisions modified, including payment process, health professional education loan forgiveness, mental health professional licensing board and practitioner requirements, and clinical trainee supervision; reports required; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Stephenson; Fischer; Hanson, J.; Becker-Finn and Franke |
2021-02-17 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1362 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Author added Klein