MN HF963 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription contraceptive supply requirements established; contraceptive methods, sterilization and related medical services, patient education, and counseling health plan coverage required; and eligible organization accommodations established.
Title
Prescription contraceptive supply requirements established; contraceptive methods, sterilization and related medical services, patient education, and counseling health plan coverage required; and eligible organization accommodations established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1084 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy