MN HF939 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Civil right to vote restored to individual upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if incarceration is not imposed, notice required, and county attorney obligation to promptly investigate voter registration and eligibility repealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil right to vote restored to individual upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if incarceration is not imposed, notice required, and county attorney obligation to promptly investigate voter registration and eligibility repealed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF1191 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Author added Cohen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback