MN HF931 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Certification requirements for the names of candidates for president and vice president of the United States modified.
Title
Certification requirements for the names of candidates for president and vice president of the United States modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2203 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections