MN HF930 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Commissioner of human services directed to develop medical assistance TEFRA enrollment content, medical assistance TEFRA stakeholder group option established, and report required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioner of human services directed to develop medical assistance TEFRA enrollment content, medical assistance TEFRA stakeholder group option established, and report required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-03-27HouseAuthors added Schomacker and Sandstede
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Carlson, L.
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Her
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Noor
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Lucero
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Hansen
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF494 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Author added Kiffmeyer

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback