MN HF927 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Manufactured home certificates of title governing provisions modified.
Title
Manufactured home certificates of title governing provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-03-18 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Moller |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Koznick |
2021-02-18 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF675 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Second reading