MN HF927 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Swing bed license conditions modified.
Title
Swing bed license conditions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1705 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy