MN HF926 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Blaine; regional public safety training facility funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Blaine; regional public safety training facility funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Raleigh |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added West |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF823 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Referred to Capital Investment