MN HF926 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Author added Lee.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Author added Lee.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marijuana; individuals age 21 years old allowed to consume and use marijuana for personal use, regulation provided, marijuana establishment activities permitted, rulemaking authorized, criminal penalties provided, fee schedule and tax development required, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Marijuana; individuals age 21 years old allowed to consume and use marijuana for personal use, regulation provided, marijuana establishment activities permitted, rulemaking authorized, criminal penalties provided, fee schedule and tax development required, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-02-20 | House | Author added Hausman. |
2017-02-13 | House | Authors added Omar, Mariani, and Moran. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |