MN HF921 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author stricken Gruenhagen
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Commissioner of human services required to contract with dental administrators to administer dental services to medical assistance and MinnesotaCare recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioner of human services required to contract with dental administrators to administer dental services to medical assistance and MinnesotaCare recipients.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor stricken Gruenhagen
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1151 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback