MN HF916 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Pinto
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Pinto
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pets or companion animals; knowing euthanasia with nonanesthetic gas prohibited, and penalties provided.
Title
Pets or companion animals; knowing euthanasia with nonanesthetic gas prohibited, and penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Pinto |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Her |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF960 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy