MN HF911 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Authors added Bernardy and Olson, L.
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Authors added Bernardy and Olson, L.
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Head Start appropriation distribution modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Head Start appropriation distribution modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] |
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Bernardy and Olson, L. |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Greenman |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1014 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy