MN HF905 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Author added Davnie
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Author added Davnie
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement civilian review board authority to discipline peace officers restrictions repealed.
Title
Law enforcement civilian review board authority to discipline peace officers restrictions repealed.
Sponsors
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Author added Davnie |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Feist, Hornstein |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |