MN HF901 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Christensen.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Christensen.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle lease sales tax revenue allocation modified.
Title
Motor vehicle lease sales tax revenue allocation modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] |
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Roz Peterson [R] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Drew Christensen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Davids. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Baker. |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Peterson. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF932 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Author added Little