MN HF900 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Agbaje
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Agbaje
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Shelter resident rights and shelter provider practice task force established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Shelter resident rights and shelter provider practice task force established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Hassan |
2021-02-17 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division |
2021-02-10 | House | Authors added Jordan and Howard |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1120 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Housing Finance and Policy