MN HF90 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Authors added Bierman, Loeffler, and Sanstede
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 8:00 am in 120 State Capitol
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Assisted living resident consumer protections established, assisted living establishment license established, penalties provided, rulemaking authority granted, and reports required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted living resident consumer protections established, assisted living establishment license established, penalties provided, rulemaking authority granted, and reports required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthors added Bierman, Loeffler, and Sanstede
2019-03-28HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-25HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-25HouseReferred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce
2019-03-04HouseAuthors added Moller and Youakim
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-02-25HouseAuthors added Bernardy and Becker-Finn
2019-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-21HouseAuthors stricken Layman and Gruenhagen
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Gruenhagen
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Layman
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF8 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback