MN HF9 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus elections bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus elections bill.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2021-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education Finance and Policy
2021-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
2021-02-18HouseAuthors added Acomb and Fischer
2021-02-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
2021-02-15HouseAuthor added Feist
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-01-25HouseAuthors added Bernardy, Hollins, Bierman, and Elkins
2021-01-14HouseAuthors added Her and Boldon
2021-01-11HouseAuthors added Stephenson; Frazier; Schultz; Howard; Long; Olson, L.; Noor; Becker-Finn; Youakim; Lee; Pinto; Freiberg; Davnie; Vang; Bahner; Reyer; Lillie; Jordan; Agbaje; Edelson; Hassan; Hanson, J.; Lippert
2021-01-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections

Same As/Similar To

SF422 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0009&ssn=0&y=2021
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=0&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=1&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=2&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=3&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=4&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=5&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF9&version=6&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf

Bill Comments

feedback