MN HF898 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-referred by committee to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-referred by committee to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
License reinstatement diversion pilot program made permanent, and report required.
Title
License reinstatement diversion pilot program made permanent, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Re-referred by committee to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-05 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added McDonald |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1004 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Second reading