MN HF895 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Elkins
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Elkins
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Underinsured and uninsured motorist coverage required for motorcycles.
Title
Underinsured and uninsured motorist coverage required for motorcycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Elkins |
2022-02-10 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-10 | House | Authors added Stephenson and Long |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1428 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy