MN HF89 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Referred by Chair to Local Government Division
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; ranked-choice voting; use in federal and state office provided; jurisdictions authorized to adopt and use for local offices; adoption, implementation, and use of ranked-choice voting procedures established; electronic voting systems with reallocation feature use by municipalities allowed; and rulemaking authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; ranked-choice voting; use in federal and state office provided; jurisdictions authorized to adopt and use for local offices; adoption, implementation, and use of ranked-choice voting procedures established; electronic voting systems with reallocation feature use by municipalities allowed; and rulemaking authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseReferred by Chair to Local Government Division
2021-02-04HouseAuthors added Sundin and Huot
2021-01-28HouseAuthors added Lippert, Wolgamott, Pinto, Her, Fischer, Bernardy, and Thompson
2021-01-25HouseAuthors added Hassan, Howard, and Reyer
2021-01-21HouseAuthors added Jordan and Davnie
2021-01-19HouseAuthors added Freiberg; Stephenson; Frazier; Berg; Feist; Olson, L.; Bierman; Xiong, J.; Hornstein; Edelson; Bahner; Morrison; Sandell; Hanson, J.; Long; Boldon; Hollins; Moller; and Pryor
2021-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections

Same As/Similar To

SF218 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Author added Torres Ray

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback