MN HF887 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Noor
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Noor
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parenting time presumptions modified, and parenting time schedule findings required.
Title
Parenting time presumptions modified, and parenting time schedule findings required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Noor |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Miller |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Brand and Elkins |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Baker and Wolgamott |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |