MN HF880 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Trapping on private lands without written permission prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trapping on private lands without written permission prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Fischer
2019-03-13HouseAuthor stricken Her
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Freiberg, Youakim, Hornstein, and Her
2019-02-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF842 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback