MN HF880 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural education teacher loan forgiveness provided, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Title
Agricultural education teacher loan forgiveness provided, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
2015-02-26 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2015-02-19 | House | Author added Bly. |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1084 (Similar To) 2015-03-12 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government