MN HF88 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homesteads owned by persons age 65 or older valuation and taxation increases limited.
Title
Homesteads owned by persons age 65 or older valuation and taxation increases limited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-02-11 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF93 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Author added Hawj