MN HF874 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author stricken Keeler
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author stricken Keeler
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fundamental right to quality public education for all children provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Fundamental right to quality public education for all children provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Author stricken Keeler |
2021-05-03 | House | Author stricken Koznick |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Demuth |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Lee |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Daniels |
2021-03-08 | House | Author stricken Scott |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Keeler |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Albright |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Baker and Scott |
2021-02-18 | House | Author stricken Thompson |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Bennett |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |