MN HF872 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul YMCA facility funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul YMCA facility funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF607 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Capital Investment