MN HF869 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Theis
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Theis
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vendors excluded from remitting June sales tax collections on an accelerated basis.
Title
Vendors excluded from remitting June sales tax collections on an accelerated basis.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Tabke |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF329 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Author added Rest