MN HF865 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Youakim
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Youakim
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Phased-in subtraction for income from public pension plans provided.
Title
Phased-in subtraction for income from public pension plans provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Youakim |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Becker-Finn added as chief author |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF147 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Taxes