MN HF864 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement mental health unit data classified as private.
Title
Law enforcement mental health unit data classified as private.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF234 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy