MN HF861 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus transportation finance bill.
Title
Omnibus transportation finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 35 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 75 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 74 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 1 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 75 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 74 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 1 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 62 | |
2017-05-15 | Governor's action Veto | |
2017-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Third reading vote: 35-31 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-15 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2017-05-10 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 75-56 |
2017-05-10 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-10 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 74-58 |
2017-05-10 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Osmek, and Sparks. |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-18 | House | House conferees Torkelson, Runbeck, Petersburg, Koznick, and Howe. |
2017-04-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Kiffmeyer; Osmek; Sparks |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House conferees Torkelson; Runbeck; Petersburg; Koznick; Howe |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-27 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Special Order: Amended SF1060 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Taken from table |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid on table |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Taken from table |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Laid on table |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 76-54 |
2017-03-31 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-03-31 | House | Amended |
2017-03-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, March 31, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1060 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - HF passed, no substitution HF861