MN HF859 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Ozmek, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Ozmek, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Koochiching County; Transportation Department unused or divided land conveyance provided, highways on the trunk highway system removed or modified, and state-owned land conveyance authorized.
Title
Koochiching County; Transportation Department unused or divided land conveyance provided, highways on the trunk highway system removed or modified, and state-owned land conveyance authorized.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Ozmek, Sparks |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Kiffmeyer; Osmek; Sparks |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | House conferees Torkelson; Runbeck; Petersburg; Howe; Koznick |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill returned to conference committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Taken from table in House |
2018-02-20 | House | House conferees Torkelson, Runbeck, Petersburg, Howe, and Koznick. |
2018-02-20 | House | New conference committee of 5 requested |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to take from table |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Kiffmeyer, Osmek, and Sparks. |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-05-19 | House | House conferees Torkelson, Runbeck, Petersburg, Howe, and Koznick. |
2017-05-19 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Kiffmeyer; Osmek; Sparks |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House conferees Torkelson; Runbeck; Petersburg; Howe; Koznick |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 58-0 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1059 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1059, now on General Orders |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading |
2017-04-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1059 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF859