MN HF855 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal government; a resolution to impose fiscal constraints, limit power and jurisdiction, and limit terms and office for members of Congress.
Title
Federal government; a resolution to impose fiscal constraints, limit power and jurisdiction, and limit terms and office for members of Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] |
Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-04-05 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Vogel |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Fabian |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Lucero and Nornes |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |