MN HF85 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 25 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency Medical Services Regulatory Board authorized to propose guidelines authorizing patient-assisted medication administration in emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Services Regulatory Board authorized to propose guidelines authorizing patient-assisted medication administration in emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Secretary of State Chapter 25 05/15/2019
2019-05-15 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-15 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-05-15 Governor approval
2019-05-13 Presented to Governor
2019-05-10SenateHouse concurred and repassed bill
2019-05-10HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate
2019-05-10HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2019-05-10HouseMotion prevailed
2019-05-10HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2019-05-09HouseHouse rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
2019-05-07SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Order
2019-05-06SenateSecond reading
2019-05-06SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF153
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF153, now on General Orders
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-03-26SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-26SenateReceived from House
2019-03-25HouseBill was passed
2019-03-25HouseThird reading
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Jurgens
2019-03-21HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Heintzeman, Bernardy, and Baker
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-03-12HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-27HouseMotion prevailed
2019-02-27HouseMotion to re-refer Ways and Means
2019-02-27HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Gunther
2019-02-25HouseSecond reading
2019-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Demuth
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Munson
2019-01-24HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-01-22HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF165 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
SF153 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF85

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0085&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF85&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF85&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF85&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0085&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10095
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0085&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10095
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=4228
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0085&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10433

Bill Comments

feedback