MN HF841 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Kunesh-Podein
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Kunesh-Podein
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Women of Color Opportunity Act enacted, pilot projects created, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Women of Color Opportunity Act enacted, pilot projects created, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Persell |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Hassan |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1123 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy